COLLINGS PARK TRUST

Charity number: 1163248
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 05/04/2016 05/04/2017 05/04/2018 05/04/2019 05/04/2020
Total gross income £24.16k £7.06k £5.92k £3.25k £2.45k
Total expenditure £159 £20.80k £8.25k £3.07k £2.68k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £5.00k £1.37k £0 N/A N/A