Financial history BRITISH AND EIRE ASSOCIATION OF VITREORETINAL SURGEONS

Charity number: 1163671
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2016 30/09/2017 30/09/2018 30/09/2019 30/09/2020
Total gross income £229.96k £6.91k £9.27k £5.28k £19.10k
Total expenditure £66.97k £15.44k £35.81k £25.57k £21.80k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A