Financial history GROWING AGAINST VIOLENCE

Charity number: 1163738
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2016 30/09/2017 30/09/2018 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £183.21k £165.11k £168.88k £352.41k £116.10k
Total expenditure £203.55k £167.63k £149.79k £281.36k £117.01k
Income from government contracts £163.17k £159.06k N/A £313.09k £91.14k
Income from government grants £0 £0 £158.41k N/A N/A