Governing document THE VALE ROYAL TALKING NEWSPAPER
Charity number: 506227
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTIUTION ADOPTED 28 MARCH 1977 AS AMENDED 25 JUNE 1985 AND 14 MARCH 1995. AS AMENDED ON 08 MAR 2016 as amended on 10 Mar 2020 as amended on 17 Mar 2021
Charitable objects
TO PROVIDE THE VISUALLY IMPAIRED OR THOSE LABOURING UNDER SOME TEMPORARY OR PERMANENT INCAPABILITY (OR DISABILITY)WHICH MAKES READING A STRAIN WITH RECORDED ELECTRONIC MATERIAL
Area of benefit
The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.
NOT DEFINED
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.