Dogfen lywodraethu BLAKENEY HARBOUR ASSOCIATION
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
CIO - Association Registered 20 Aug 2015 as amended on 17 Apr 2019 as amended on 18 Sep 2019 as amended on 08 Aug 2020 as amended on 16 Jun 2022
Gwrthrychau elusennol
(1) the maintenance, improvement, protection and conservation of the Blakeney harbour for the benefit of the public including all users of the harbour and the communities of Blakeney, Morston, Stiffkey and Cley; (2) the advancement of education through the provision of advice and information to the users of Blakeney harbour and the communities of Blakeney, Morston, Stiffkey and Cley relating to the harbour and its surrounding areas; and (3) the promotion of public safety and the prevention and deterrence of crime in and around Blakeney harbour.
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.