MUTUALITE BANA MAMA

Charity number: 1163319
Charity reporting is up to date (52 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £5.50k £5.58k £1.20k £0 £1.00k
Total expenditure £3.83k £3.80k £1.60k £0 £850
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A