Trustees ASHFORD STREET PASTORS

Charity number: 1162670
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Thanabalasooriya Shanmugam Chair 31 July 2021
None on record
Robert Stephen Pierson-Webber Trustee 31 July 2021
None on record
Caroline Marshall Trustee 23 July 2020
None on record
Susan Boulden Trustee 20 July 2017
None on record
LESLEY STACEY Trustee 15 July 2015
None on record
ROB SAUNDERS Trustee 22 January 2015
None on record