LONDON JEWISH FAMILY CENTRE LTD

Charity number: 1162132
Charity reporting is up to date (80 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 27/02/2016 28/02/2017 28/02/2018 28/02/2019 29/02/2020
Total gross income £372.52k £243.88k £281.71k £315.78k £292.57k
Total expenditure £292.68k £242.75k £284.79k £315.86k £297.58k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £9.29k N/A N/A