Financial history FISHER CHARITABLE FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1164310
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/10/2016 31/10/2017 31/10/2018 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £50.10k £50.14k £50.21k £50.22k £50.22k
Total expenditure £20.31k £27.61k £56.89k £90.35k £90.35k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A