LONGLANDS

Charity number: 1163084
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/08/2016 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020
Total gross income £59.28k £153.58k £111.82k £148.20k £173.38k
Total expenditure £26.63k £89.60k £98.59k £101.27k £117.17k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A £5.10k
Income from government grants £0 £0 £30.00k £30.00k £34.00k