ST. MARY'S JACOBITE SYRIAN ORTHODOX CHURCH, NORTHAMPTON

Charity number: 1162484
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 20 December 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 10 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 10 January 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 08 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 08 January 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 24 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 24 January 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 14 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not Required