THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST PAUL'S HOOK

Charity number: 1163071
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 21 August 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 21 August 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 05 December 2020 35 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019

(These accounts
have been qualified)

05 December 2020 35 days late Download
Annual return 31 December 2018 31 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 31 October 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2017 23 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 23 October 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2016 31 October 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 31 October 2017 On time Download