Financial history BRILHO

Charity number: 1164178
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/11/2017 30/11/2018 30/11/2019 30/11/2020 30/11/2021
Total gross income £18.54k £14.76k £6.30k £0 £0
Total expenditure £23.72k £17.62k £2.31k £0 £0
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £1.00k N/A N/A N/A N/A