Accounts and annual returns BUTTERFLIES PRE-SCHOOL BRIXHAM
Charity number: 1162444

Charity reporting is up to date (68 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 01 September 2021 | 16 May 2022 | On time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 September 2021 | 07 September 2022 | 68 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 September 2020 | 13 May 2021 | On time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 September 2020 | Overdue | Overdue by 631 days | |
Annual return | 01 September 2019 | 08 January 2020 | On time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 September 2019 | Overdue | Overdue by 996 days | |
Annual return | 01 September 2018 | 28 September 2018 | On time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 September 2018 | Overdue | Overdue by 1362 days | |
Annual return | 01 September 2017 | 25 May 2018 | On time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 September 2017 | Overdue | Overdue by 1727 days |
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window