Accounts and annual returns LIVERPOOL NORTH CENTRAL METHODIST CIRCUIT

Charity number: 1163418
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2021 19 March 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 19 March 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2020 19 March 2022 262 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 19 March 2022 262 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2019 15 January 2021 199 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 15 January 2021 199 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2018 20 January 2020 204 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 20 January 2020 204 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2017 04 September 2018 66 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017 04 September 2018 66 days late Download Open in new window