Financial history LIVERPOOL NORTH CENTRAL METHODIST CIRCUIT

Charity number: 1163418
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021
Total gross income £196.61k £111.14k £100.97k £116.27k £83.68k
Total expenditure £100.31k £112.88k £108.17k £120.07k £108.02k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A