Financial history LOWDHAM RAILWAY HERITAGE

Charity number: 1163610
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 17/09/2017 17/09/2018 17/09/2019 17/09/2020 17/09/2021
Total gross income £4.15k £4.53k £0 £7.38k £27.12k
Total expenditure £200 £5.90k £0 £3.52k £32.59k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A