BRIGHTER FUTURE INITIATIVE

Charity number: 1163023
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/10/2017 31/10/2018 31/10/2019 31/10/2020
Total gross income £0 £0 £250.48k £44.00k £8.13k
Total expenditure £200 £690 £2.11k £18.89k £22.05k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A