THE ROYAL SOUTHAMPTON YACHT CLUB TRUST (RSYCT)

Charity number: 1164006
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
BRIAN HINDE Chair 15 October 2015 None on record
Jan Ellis Trustee 01 May 2021 None on record
Tina Daniel Trustee 16 October 2019 None on record
Captain Martin Phipps MBE Trustee 14 May 2018
STEAMSHIP SHIELDHALL CHARITY Received: On time
Allan Beswick Trustee 01 April 2021 None on record