WOLLESCOTE COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 506451
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 27 October 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 18 January 2021 79 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2018 18 January 2021 445 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2017 28 November 2020 759 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2016 28 November 2020 1124 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 Not Required