Financial history DOGS TRUST WORLDWIDE

Charity number: 1167663
Charity reporting is overdue by 35 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £3.67m £3.92m £4.24m £3.85m £4.33m
Total expenditure £3.26m £3.76m £4.19m £3.91m £4.32m
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £3.67m £3.92m £4.24m £3.84m £4.33m
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £13.55k £0
Income - Charitable activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £3.26m £3.76m £4.19m £3.91m £4.32m
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £14.80k £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Grants institution £2.94m £3.13m £3.53m £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0