Financial history PAKISTAN WELFARE ASSOCIATION UK

Charity number: 1164619
Charity reporting is up to date (51 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £47.46k £71.99k £44.60k £39.09k £118.91k
Total expenditure £46.17k £50.58k £53.03k £32.59k £44.43k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A