Accounts and annual returns IN2SCIENCEUK.ORG

Charity number: 1164821
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 November 2021 05 May 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2021 05 May 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 November 2020 11 June 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2020 11 June 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 November 2019 22 July 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2019 22 July 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 November 2018 17 May 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2018 17 May 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 November 2017 23 August 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2017 23 August 2018 On time Download Open in new window