Financial history IN2SCIENCEUK.ORG

Charity number: 1164821
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/11/2017 30/11/2018 30/11/2019 30/11/2020 30/11/2021
Total gross income £139.44k £283.35k £402.34k £425.70k £779.23k
Total expenditure £135.61k £191.47k £320.31k £366.56k £512.87k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £18.30k £94.25k £19.25k N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A N/A N/A £779.23k
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Endowments N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Investment N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Other N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Legacies N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A N/A £512.87k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A N/A N/A £2.89k
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A N/A N/A £0