DARE2EXPRESS

Charity number: 1166072
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 01/04/2017 01/04/2018 01/04/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £11.94k £1.07k £2.41k £6.15k £15.01k
Total expenditure £58 £2.07k £3.38k £12.74k £2.15k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A