SOUTHEND FOODBANK

Charity number: 1163160
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 April 2020 26 February 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2020 26 February 2021 On time Download
Annual return 30 April 2019 03 April 2020 34 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2019 03 April 2020 34 days late Download
Annual return 30 April 2018 04 February 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2018 04 February 2019 On time Download
Annual return 30 April 2017 28 February 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2017 28 February 2018 On time Download
Annual return 30 April 2016 31 January 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2016 31 January 2017 On time Download