ANDOVER YOUNG CARERS

Charity number: 1163715
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 24 November 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 24 November 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 13 August 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 13 August 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 23 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 23 January 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 31 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 31 January 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2016 31 January 2018 365 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 20 March 2017 48 days late Download