ANDOVER YOUNG CARERS

Charity number: 1163715
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £39.83k £182.94k £141.32k £123.57k £123.53k
Total expenditure £84.21k £169.30k £133.81k £124.37k £124.37k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £10.00k £15.92k £15.92k £15.92k £15.78k