ACCESS BEDFORD

Charity number: 1162947
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 01/04/2016 01/04/2017 01/04/2018 01/04/2019 01/04/2020
Total gross income £10.46k £15.00k £3.32k £2.39k £10.13k
Total expenditure £7.08k £9.00k £5.09k £2.58k £6.53k
Income from government contracts £2 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £3.89k £0 £0 N/A N/A