HYLTON CASTLE COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 506554
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 22 September 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 26 August 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2018 03 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2017 26 May 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2016 23 July 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 Not Required