ST JOHN'S NURSERY GROUP

Charity number: 1163181
Charity reporting is up to date (6 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2020 06 July 2021 6 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 06 July 2021 6 days late Download
Annual return 31 August 2019 08 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 08 January 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 August 2018 06 January 2020 190 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 06 January 2020 190 days late Download
Annual return 31 August 2017 21 June 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017 21 June 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 August 2016 17 November 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2016 17 November 2016 On time Download