ST JOHN'S NURSERY GROUP

Charity number: 1163181
Charity reporting is up to date (6 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/08/2016 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020
Total gross income £146.36k £178.00k £234.26k £229.36k £269.36k
Total expenditure £151.90k £179.73k £218.01k £231.44k £266.54k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £97.86k £88.39k £135.48k £138.76k £204.43k