NEKTON FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1162666
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £3.42m £174.28k £2.21m £4.06m £1.97m
Total expenditure £2.88m £517.62k £526.36k £3.61m £2.67m
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A £55.24k
Income - Donations and legacies £1.45m N/A £450 £100.10k £55.34k
Income - Other trading activities £38.20k N/A £286.94k £553.67k £254.87k
Income - Charitable activities £1.93m N/A £1.93m £3.41m £1.66m
Income - Endowments £0 N/A £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £164 N/A £0 £0 £0
Income - Other £0 N/A £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 N/A £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £2.82m N/A £525.71k £3.61m £2.61m
Expenditure - Raising funds £55.08k N/A £658 £1.29k £56.49k
Expenditure - Governance £23.43k N/A £7.76k £7.97k £3.14k
Expenditure - Grants institution £22.73k N/A £3.00k £33.87k £2.40k
Expenditure - Investment management £0 N/A £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 N/A £0 £0 £0