Accounts and annual returns NEATH FOODBANK
Charity number: 1166053
Charity reporting is up to date (120 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 28 October 2023 | 120 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 28 October 2023 | 120 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 22 November 2022 | 145 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 22 November 2022 | 145 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 03 September 2021 | 65 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 03 September 2021 | 65 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 13 August 2020 | 44 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2018 | 31 October 2019 | 123 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2018 | Not Required |
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window