THE JAMES CLARKE AND SARAH FOLEY TRUST FOR THE ELDERLY

Charity number: 506573
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 25 March 2021 53 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 25 March 2021 419 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2018 25 March 2021 784 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2017 25 March 2021 1149 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2016 25 March 2021 1514 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 Not Required