Financial history UK FORUM ON HAEMOGLOBIN DISORDERS

Charity number: 1163743
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £14.99k £14.49k £24.85k £43.97k £43.58k
Total expenditure £24.32k £10.40k £14.38k £27.07k £31.27k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A