Accounts and annual returns PET EMERGENCY TREATMENT CHARITY

Charity number: 1163241
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 10 July 2023 Overdue Overdue by 12 days
Accounts and TAR 10 July 2023 Overdue Overdue by 12 days
Annual return 10 July 2022 Overdue Overdue by 378 days
Accounts and TAR 10 July 2022 Overdue Overdue by 378 days
Annual return 10 July 2021 Overdue Overdue by 743 days
Accounts and TAR 10 July 2021 Overdue Overdue by 743 days
Annual return 10 July 2020 Overdue Overdue by 1108 days
Accounts and TAR 10 July 2020 Overdue Overdue by 1108 days
Annual return 10 July 2019 Overdue Overdue by 1473 days
Accounts and TAR 10 July 2019 Overdue Overdue by 1473 days