ALFORD FOCAL POINT

Charity number: 1162899
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 October 2020 22 July 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2020 22 July 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 October 2019 23 July 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2019 23 July 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 October 2018 07 January 2020 129 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2018 07 January 2020 129 days late Download
Annual return 31 October 2017 19 July 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2017 14 August 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 October 2016 06 July 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2016 21 August 2017 On time Download