HONNYWILL FAMILY CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 1165336
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 15 December 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 15 December 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 01 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 01 October 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 28 September 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 28 September 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 11 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 11 January 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 27 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 27 January 2018 On time Download