HACKNEY PLAYBUS

Charity number: 1163792
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £203.58k £108.08k £161.81k £187.97k £232.64k
Total expenditure £160.22k £119.24k £129.97k £183.80k £183.73k
Income from government contracts £7.32k £0 £5.88k £18.07k N/A
Income from government grants £23.78k £51.64k £29.49k £47.57k £33.63k