Trustees SSP FOUNDATION
Charity number: 1163717
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Sukjander Singh Tiwana | Chair | 14 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Bethany Fensome | Trustee | 02 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
Christopher McNaughton Wright | Trustee | 02 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Eliot Caplan | Trustee | 24 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Lloyd Winter | Trustee | 17 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Noel Nathan James Collett | Trustee | 17 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Leslie Slye | Trustee | 15 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Roxanne Minbatiwala | Trustee | 15 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Joel Marcel Thethy | Trustee | 15 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Marisa Isabel Fitch | Trustee | 08 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
Rosie Jones | Trustee | 10 May 2016 |
|
|
||||
HELEN SUZANNE RYLANDS | Trustee | 11 August 2015 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.