THE WILDLIFE HAVEN RESCUE AND REHABILITATION CENTRE

Charity number: 1162849
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 31 October 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 28 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2018 30 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2017 27 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2016 25 October 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 Not Required