CHILDREN AT RISK IN ASIA

Charity number: 1165824
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 20 September 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 09 September 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2018 15 November 2019 15 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2017 18 July 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2016 01 June 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 Not Required