SALTFORD COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1162948
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/01/2017 31/01/2018 31/01/2019 31/01/2020 31/01/2021
Total gross income £109.67k £127.15k £131.32k £188.98k £125.25k
Total expenditure £99.33k £159.66k £107.59k £174.72k £102.07k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £9.58k £1.61k £2.11k £31.83k