SALTFORD COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1162948
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Christina Mary Easterford Trustee 06 July 2017 None on record
Martin John Coles Trustee 06 July 2017 None on record
Stephen William Seeley Trustee 25 March 2021 None on record
PETER DANDO Trustee 11 March 2019 None on record
Elisabeth Anne Lilian Evans Trustee 12 March 2018 None on record
Christopher Roland Essex Trustee 30 November 2009
SOCIETY OF OLD FRAMLINGHAMIANS CHARITABLE TRUST Received: On time
James John Davies Trustee 01 February 2016 None on record