Accounts and annual returns HELP THE PEOPLE TRUST

Charity number: 1163740
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 May 2021 28 March 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2021 28 March 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 May 2020 09 March 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2020 09 March 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 May 2019 01 November 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2019 01 November 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 May 2018 17 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2018 17 October 2018 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 May 2017 20 March 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2017 20 March 2018 On time Download Open in new window