SLIDE DANCE LIMITED

Charity number: 1164827
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2020 30 June 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 30 June 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 August 2019 27 July 2021 392 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 27 July 2021 392 days late Download
Annual return 31 August 2018 15 September 2021 808 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 15 September 2021 808 days late Download
Annual return 31 August 2017 31 May 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 October 2016 11 August 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2016 Not Required