Accounts and annual returns WORK RIGHTS CENTRE (WORC)

Charity number: 1165419
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2022 27 January 2023 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 27 January 2023 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 30 November 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 30 November 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 06 December 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 06 December 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2019 17 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 17 January 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2018 31 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 31 January 2019 On time Download Open in new window