Financial history WORK RIGHTS CENTRE (WORC)

Charity number: 1165419
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £15.29k £52.48k £85.16k £215.64k £253.61k
Total expenditure £9.53k £38.40k £60.69k £129.89k £242.42k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £13.54k £9.98k £11.47k £9.50k £52.18k