Accounts and annual returns HILLINGDON BRAIN TUMOUR & BRAIN INJURY GROUP

Charity number: 1164538
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 November 2021 20 March 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2021 20 March 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 November 2020 17 June 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2020 17 June 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 November 2019 05 October 2020 5 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2019 05 October 2020 5 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 November 2018 09 July 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2018 09 July 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 November 2017 20 July 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2017 20 July 2018 On time Download Open in new window